The 41st ParliamentMinistry29 September 2006 - 30 January 2007 CabinetPrime Minister Minister for Transport and Regional Services Treasurer Minister for Foreign Affairs Minister for Defence Minister for Finance and Administration Minister for Health and Ageing Attorney-General Minister for Communications, Information Technology and the Arts Minister for Trade Minister for Immigration and Multicultural Affairs Minister for Education, Science and Training Minister for Families, Community Services and Indigenous Affairs Minister for Employment and Workplace Relations Outer MinistryMinister for Vocational and Technical Education Minister for Local Government, Territories and Roads Minister for Revenue and Assistant Treasurer Minister for Veterans' Affairs and Minister Assisting the Minister
for Defence Minister for Human Services Special Minister of State Minister for Ageing Minister for Justice and Customs Minister for the Arts and Sport Minister for Fisheries, Forestry and Conservation Minister for Community Services Minister for Small Business and Tourism Minister for Workforce Participation Parliamentary SecretariesParliamentary Secretary to the Prime Minister Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister for Transport and Regional
Services Parliamentary Secretary to the Treasurer Parliamentary Secretary (Foreign Affairs) Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister for Defence Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister for Finance and Administration Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister for Health and Ageing Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister for the Environment and Heritage Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister for Agriculture, Fisheries
and Forestry Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister for Education, Science
and Training Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister for Industry, Tourism and
Resources Previous Ministry 10 August - 29 September 2006 Previous Ministry 27 January - 10 August 2006 Previous Ministry 6 July 2005 -
27 January 2006 Previous Ministry 18 July 2004 - 22 October 2004 |