Name in Home Country / Full Name: |
Wilmer Cabrera Linares |
---|---|
Date of birth/Age: | Sep 15, 1967 (57) |
Place of Birth: | Cartagena |
Citizenship: |
Colombia United States |
Avg. term as coach: |
1.77 Years |
Coaching Licence: | A Licence |
Preferred formation: | 4-2-3-1 |
Wilmer Cabrera
Major League Soccer
- Date of birth/Age: Sep 15, 1967 (57)
- Place of birth: Cartagena
- Citizenship: Colombia
- Coaching Licence : A Licence
- Avg. term as coach : 1.77 Years
- Preferred formation : 4-2-3-1
Former player:
Last club :
Long Island RR
Most games for :
CD América
Retired :
Jan 1, 2006
Personal Details
Stats
No information available.
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
El Paso Manager | 23/24 (May 20, 2024) | expected - | 18 | 1.11 | ||
RGV FC Toros Manager | 20/21 (Feb 11, 2021) | 23/24 (Nov 21, 2023) | 106 | 1.37 | ||
RGV FC Toros Sporting Director | 20/21 (Feb 11, 2021) | 23/24 (Nov 21, 2023) | - | 0.00 | ||
Montreal Manager | 19/20 (Aug 21, 2019) | 19/20 (Dec 31, 2019) | 9 | 1.44 | ||
Houston Manager | 16/17 (Jan 1, 2017) | 19/20 (Aug 13, 2019) | 112 | 1.36 | ||
RGV FC Toros Manager | 15/16 (Dec 2, 2015) | 16/17 (Dec 31, 2016) | 31 | 1.65 | ||
Chivas USA Manager | 13/14 (Jan 9, 2014) | 14/15 (Dec 31, 2014) | 35 | 0.94 | ||
Colorado Assistant Manager | 11/12 (Jan 31, 2012) | 13/14 (Jan 8, 2014) | - | 0.00 | ||
Assistant Manager of: Óscar Pareja (72 Games) | ||||||
USA U17 Manager | 07/08 (Oct 25, 2007) | 11/12 (Jan 23, 2012) | 16 | 2.13 | ||
USA U18 Assistant Manager | 06/07 (Dec 31, 2006) | 07/08 (Oct 24, 2007) | - | 0.00 | ||
BW Gottschee Manager | 05/06 | 06/07 (Dec 31, 2006) | - | 0.00 |
Former clubs
Suffolk County Community College (2005-2006, Co-Trainer)
Transfer history as a player
This page displays all transfers for the selected player. Alongside the date of the transfer, the clubs involved and the transfer fee, it also displays the market value of the player at the time of the transfer.
Season | Date | Left | Joined | MV | Fee | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/06 | Jan 1, 2006 | Long Island RR | Retired | - | - | |||||
04/05 | Jul 1, 2004 | Herediano | Long Island RR | - | ? | |||||
00/01 | Jan 1, 2001 | Deportes Tolima | Herediano | - | ? | |||||
99/00 | Jul 1, 1999 | Indep. Santa Fe | Deportes Tolima | - | ? | |||||
98/99 | Jan 1, 1999 | Millonarios | Indep. Santa Fe | - | ? | |||||
98/99 | Jul 1, 1998 | Independiente | Millonarios | - | ? | |||||
97/98 | Jul 1, 1997 | CD América | Independiente | - | ? | |||||
89/90 | Jan 1, 1990 | Indep. Santa Fe | CD América | - | ? | |||||
84/85 | Jan 1, 1985 | Santa Fe U20 | Indep. Santa Fe | - | - | |||||
Total transfer fees: | 0 |
Further details
Wilmer Cabrera is the father of Andy Cabrera (El Paso Locomotive FC).
Wilmer Cabrera is the father of David Cabrera (Without Club).
Wilmer Cabrera is the father of David Cabrera (Without Club).